+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:52PM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:35PM.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 20, 2017: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
February 13, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
January 25, 2017: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 7