+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:41PM.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
March 9, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 3
February 22, 2017: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 22, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 20, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 25, 2017: Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8