+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:37PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee: do pass.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- RULES (ref Bill) adopted
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
May 6, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
May 6, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
March 2, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 2, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2016: Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2016: House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 16, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
February 16, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
January 26, 2016: Senate Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 26, 2016: Natural Resources: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor