+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 11, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- Amendment passed: NRPS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On June 7, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Public Safety
- House first read
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref JUD)
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (11)
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
1-30 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
February 21, 2007: Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
February 21, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 12, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 24, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor