+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by COM - replaced by substitute
- SUB Floor Amend to COM - Cook - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Petersen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
May 3, 2021: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
April 27, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
March 8, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
March 8, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 2, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
January 21, 2021: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor