+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- PSMT (ref Bill) adopted
- RULES (ref PSMT) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee: do pass amended.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee.
+ − Amendments (5)
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 5, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
May 5, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
March 2, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 2, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 18, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
January 26, 2016: Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 26, 2016: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2016: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
January 26, 2016: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor