+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Huppenthal flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 2:25 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Huppenthal Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-16 jud_asvetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
Huppenthal Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 29, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
March 1, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
January 28, 2010: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor