+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee: do pass.
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (12)
May 6, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 23
May 6, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 6
March 1, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2016: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
March 1, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 1, 2016: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
January 26, 2016: Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 5
January 26, 2016: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
January 26, 2016: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor