+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Substituted House bill on third reading
- Amendment adopted: Barto flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: HMLR (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Vote
January 26, 2011: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor