+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment withdrawn: HEALTH (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass amended
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Senate second read
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 31, 2008: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2008: Health: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor