+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Petersen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 11:10AM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
January 22, 2018: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor