+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 323 w/o
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Gray
- Amendment substituted: Floor Amend to Bill - Harper
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to Harper Flr Amnd to Bill - Montenegro
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:07 pmobject
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Gray flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (12)
Gray flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rick Gray Floor Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Montenegro Substitute Floor Amendment to the Harper Floor Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Montenegro Substitute Floor Amendment to the Harper Floor Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rick Gray Floor Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Gray flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-21 nrt_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
4-19 nrt_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
1-27 nrt
Senate Fact Sheet
5-3 nrt_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 4
April 19, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2011: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 17, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2011: Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6