+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 101 e
- Action: Signed
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to Senate
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 3:07 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: NRT (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass amended
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Transportation
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
2-8 nrt_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
March 7, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 7, 2011: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 26, 2011: Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor