+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Placed on the consent calendar at 10:25AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Criminal Justice Reform Committee: do pass.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: withdrawn.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Criminal Justice Reform Committee.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:36PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 24
March 1, 2021: House Criminal Justice Reform Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 1, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 11, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 21, 2021: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor