+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
January 22, 2018: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor