+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Weninger - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:45PM.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- COM (ref Bill) withdrawn
- Mesnard flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 7, 2021: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 30
April 5, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
March 1, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 1, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 17, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 21, 2021: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor