+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Vote
January 28, 2010: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1