+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Final reading in Senate: Failed
- Senate concurred.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Carter #1 - passed
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Kavanagh flr amend (ref GOV) adopted
- GOV (ref Bill) adopted
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (7)
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Kavanagh flr amend (ref GOV) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Carter #1 - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 4, 2016: Senate final read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2016: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 14
April 26, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
April 26, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
March 8, 2016: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
March 8, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 8, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 8, 2016: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
March 3, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
March 3, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
January 26, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
January 26, 2016: Government: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor