+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:29PM.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- ED (ref Bill) adopted
- Short title updated, after districts strike : insert ; to read: school districts; procurement practices; auditors
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 8, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 13
March 12, 2019: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
March 12, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 28, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 30, 2019: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor