+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Amendment passed: ED
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Crandall flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Education - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Crandall flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
3-28 ed_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
Crandall flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-28 ed_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
2-2 ed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 5, 2012: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 27, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 5
March 1, 2012: Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
January 24, 2012: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor