+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:59PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (10)
March 16, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
March 16, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 11
February 18, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 18, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 18, 2016: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 18, 2016: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
February 11, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2016: Natural Resources: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
January 26, 2016: Senate Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1