+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
- Chapter: 231
- Action: Signed
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
On May 14, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate adopts conference committee
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- House appointed: Reagan, Crump, Miranda B
- Recommendation: that the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Senate appointed: Leff, Blendu, Miranda
On April 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to COM - Reagan
- Amendment: COM
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CED (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Leff flr amend (ref CED)
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate second read
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (19)
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Reagan SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the COMMERCE Committee amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Leff Floor Amendment, reference to CED amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Reagan SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the COMMERCE Committee amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2-15 strikermemo caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Leff Floor Amendment, reference to CED amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
May 21, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
May 14, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 17, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
March 6, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 6, 2007: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
January 24, 2007: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor