+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 110
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 14, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 12, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: HEALTH (ref Bill)
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
2-8 health
Senate Fact Sheet
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 14, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 5
March 8, 2010: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2010: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 22, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2010: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor