+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Rules
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:20 pm
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-14 trans-fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
January 29, 2014: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2014: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor