+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 amobject
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Senate second read
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (2)
2-20gov
Senate Fact Sheet
5-14 as vetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 14, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 2
March 19, 2008: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
March 19, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
March 13, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
January 31, 2008: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor