+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Senate concurred.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by APPROP - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to APPROP - Thorpe - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Education Committee: withdrawn.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Transmit to House.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- ED (ref Bill) adopted
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
May 3, 2018: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
May 3, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 25
March 1, 2018: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
March 1, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 28, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 22, 2018: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 22, 2018: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor