+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 312
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On May 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senator Nelson motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass SB 1254 on Final Reading on April 29, 2010. Motion carried.: 05/03/10
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Failed
- Vote detail 19 8 3 0 passed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
On April 26, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: WE - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to WE - Mason
On April 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 8, 2010 in the House:
- Water and Energy: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- House second read
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Water and Energy
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CED (ref Bill)
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (12)
Water and Energy - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Water and Energy - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Mason Floor amendment; reference to the Water and Energy Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Water and Energy - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Mason Floor amendment; reference to the Water and Energy Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
4-29 ced_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
Water and Energy - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
6-1 ced_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 29, 2010: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
April 29, 2010: Senate final read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 3
April 29, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 4
April 7, 2010: Water and Energy: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
April 7, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
January 28, 2010: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor