+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 275
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 22, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: NRRA - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to NRRA - Konopnicki
On April 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole motion: TRANSMIT TO HOUSE: 03/03/10
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Amendment withdrawn: RULES (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Garcia flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Aguirre flr amend (ref Bill) (sub Garcia flr amend)
- Vote detail 13 8 8 0 1
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (12)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Aguirre Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Konopnicki Floor amendment; reference to the Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Aguirre Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Konopnicki Floor amendment; reference to the Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 28, 2010: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
April 28, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2010: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
March 15, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2010: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1