+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 195
- Action: Signed
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
On April 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: TRANS
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Waring flr amend (ref TRANS)
- Amendment adopted: TRANS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Government: Withdrawn
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Senate second read
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (14)
Transportation - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Waring Floor Amendment, reference to TRANS Committee Amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Waring Floor Amendment, reference to TRANS Committee Amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-2 trans strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
2-12 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
4-2 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
4-25 house changes memo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
May 2, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
February 21, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
February 21, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 21, 2007: Transportation: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
February 19, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 30, 2007: Transportation: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor