+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:53PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Banking and Insurance Committee: do pass.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Banking and Insurance Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- RULES (ref Bill) adopted
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 15, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
February 19, 2018: House Banking and Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 19, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 12, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 22, 2018: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor