+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Banking and Insurance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Banking and Insurance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Banking and Insurance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Banking and Insurance
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Vote
January 24, 2012: Banking and Insurance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor