+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: held.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:12PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
February 8, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 22, 2018: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor