+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 77 e
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Driggs flr amend (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:55 pmobject
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Driggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Driggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-6 approp_aspassedcow
Senate Fact Sheet
2-21 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 13, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
March 13, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 5
January 28, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9