+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 3, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: do pass.
On March 27, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 23, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
March 23, 2023: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 16, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
January 26, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
January 26, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor