+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 194
- Action: Signed
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to HS - Pearce
- Amendment: HS - passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Human Services
- House first read
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: McCune Davis flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 12:40 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate second read
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (12)
Human Services - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
McCune Davis Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Pearce Floor Amendment, reference to the HUMAN SERVICES Committee amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Human Services - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Human Services - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
McCune Davis Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Human Services - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Pearce Floor Amendment, reference to the HUMAN SERVICES Committee amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2-21 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
5-15 as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
1-30 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
4-26 house changes memo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
May 2, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
February 22, 2007: Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 22, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
February 19, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
January 24, 2007: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor