+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Bill passed dp by s/v 27-25
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:01PM.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Local and International Affairs Committee: do pass.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Local and International Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:06PM.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 24
February 19, 2018: House Local and International Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 19, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 5, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
January 18, 2018: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor