+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 154
- Action: Signed
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Barto
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On June 24, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On June 23, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- House first read
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Paton flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate second read
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Paton Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Barto Floor amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Paton Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
1246PSHS_AS PASSED BY THE SENATE
Senate Fact Sheet
Barto Floor amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
1246pshs_AS ENACTED
Senate Fact Sheet
6-15 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
6-29 house changes memo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
June 29, 2009: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 9
June 23, 2009: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
June 23, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
June 22, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
June 4, 2009: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor