+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:27PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: withdrawn.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Vote
January 20, 2022: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor