+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred.
- Transmit to Governor.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth - passed
- Amended by MAPS - Borrelli - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Bowers - passed
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- NR (ref Bill) adopted
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources Committee: do pass amended.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (13)
Natural Resources
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Bowers - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (14)
May 4, 2016: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2016: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 28
April 13, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 3
April 13, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2016: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
March 2, 2016: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 2, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 25, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
January 26, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 26, 2016: Natural Resources: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2016: Senate Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 6