+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
On June 13, 2023 in the House:
- Representative Livingston made a motion to reconsider SB1244 and be placed on Third Reading of bills today. Passed by v/v.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On June 12, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Amended by APPROP - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to APPROP - Livingston - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On April 3, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: withdrawn.
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- MAPS (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee: do pass amended.
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
June 13, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 12
March 21, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 21, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
March 16, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
February 7, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
February 7, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
February 7, 2023: Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor