+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 183
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 29, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 15, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Cheuvront flr amend (ref Bill)
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (5)
June 29, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 6
June 16, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
June 16, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
June 15, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
June 4, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor