+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 182 e
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 24, 2009 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
- House second read
On June 23, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Pearce flr amend (ref Bill)
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Do pass
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Pearce Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
6-11 gov_corrected
Senate Fact Sheet
Pearce Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
1242gov
Senate Fact Sheet
1242_ as passed by the senate
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 10
June 23, 2009: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
June 23, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
June 22, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 4, 2009: Government Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor