+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:35PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- House Health & Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Pace flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:25PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 10, 2022: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 5
February 23, 2022: House Health & Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 23, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 14, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
January 20, 2022: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor