+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 19, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held in House
On April 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On April 5, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On April 1, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref APPROP)
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2010: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
April 1, 2010: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
March 29, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
February 18, 2010: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor