+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (2)
January 26, 2016: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
January 26, 2016: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor