+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:22 pmobject
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2013: Public Safety: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
February 5, 2013: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor