+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 173
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 1:43 pm
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Murphy flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:17 pmobject
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Murphy flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-22 jud_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
Murphy flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
1-30 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
March 27, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
February 21, 2012: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 21, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
January 24, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor