+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 85
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Mitchell
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Lesko flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Lesko flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Mitchell - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 24, 2015: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 19, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
March 3, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2015: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 25, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2015: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor