+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 231
- Action: Signed
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Ash
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 4:45 pmobject
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- House first read
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Ash Floor Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Ash Floor Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
1-31 health
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 18, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 5
February 28, 2011: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 28, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 22, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 25, 2011: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor