+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
- Consent calendar: 12:38 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement: Do pass
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
- Senate second read
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Proposed Amendment
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Proposed Amendment
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Proposed Amendment
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Vote
January 30, 2008: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor